US HB115 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Thin Blue Line Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to expand the list of statutory aggravating factors in death penalty determinations to also include killing or targeting a law enforcement officer, firefighter, or other first responder.
Title
Thin Blue Line Act
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - On passage RC# 265 (Y: 271 N: 143 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-18 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 271 - 143 (Roll no. 265). (text: CR H4333) |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4341) |
2017-05-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 115, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Conyers demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until later in the legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-05-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 115. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 115 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-17 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read. |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 323. (consideration: CR H4332-4340) |
2017-05-17 | House | Rule H. Res. 323 passed House. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 323 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 115 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-17 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read. |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 69. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-116. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR323 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1085 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1085 (Related) 2017-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime