US HB1140 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to waive application of certain requirements with respect to processing and refining a critical energy resource at a critical energy resource facility, and for other purposes.
Title
To authorize the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to waive application of certain requirements with respect to processing and refining a critical energy resource at a critical energy resource facility, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9. |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-16. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 21. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 6 . |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Minerals. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
HB7476 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Rules, the Judiciary, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
HB7476 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Rules, the Judiciary, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.