US HB1101 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Viral Hepatitis Testing Act of 2015 Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to carry out hepatitis B (HBV) and hepatitis C (HCV) virus infection surveillance, education, and testing programs. Requires HHS to establish a national system regarding HBV and HCV infections, with its goals being to: determine the prevalence of infections, increase the number of individuals tested and made aware of their status, develop and disseminate public information and education programs, improve the training of health professionals, and provide referrals for counseling and medical treatment and ensure the provision of follow-up services. Directs HHS to determine the populations that are considered at high risk for HBV or HCV infection. Requires HHS to develop benchmarks for activities conducted under the Action Plan for the Prevention, Care, & Treatment of Viral Hepatitis. Directs HHS to establish and support public-private partnerships that facilitate HBV and HCV surveillance, education, screening, testing, and linkage to care programs. Requires the Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality to convene the U.S. Preventive Services Task Force every three years to review its recommendation for HBV and HCV screening. Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide certain veterans with an HBV and HCV risk assessment, and, as needed, an evaluation and information regarding their need for treatment, vaccination, or other therapy.
Title
Viral Hepatitis Testing Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1287 (Same As) 2015-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cancer
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Public-private cooperation
Veterans' medical care
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Public-private cooperation
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1101/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1101/BILLS-114hr1101ih.pdf |