US HB1059 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize notaries public to perform, and to establish minimum standards for, electronic notarizations and remote notarizations that occur in or affect interstate commerce, to require any Federal court to recognize notarizations performed by a notarial officer of any State, to require any State to recognize notarizations performed by a notarial officer of any other State when the notarization was performed under or relates to a public Act, record, or judicial proceeding of the notarial officer's State or when the notarization occurs in or affects interstate commerce, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing and Enabling Commerce Using Remote and Electronic Notarization Act of 2023 SECURE Notarization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2023-02-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-02-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H893-894) |
2023-02-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1059. |
2023-02-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H892-896) |
2023-02-27 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1212 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.