US HB1044 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Port Chicago Naval Magazine National Memorial Enhancement Act of 2009 - Amends the Port Chicago National Memorial Act of 1992 to require the Secretary of the Interior to administer the Port Chicago Naval Magazine National Memorial as a unit of the National Park System. Directs the Secretary of Defense to transfer a specified parcel of land within the proposed boundary on the map entitled "Port Chicago Naval Magazine National Memorial, Proposed Boundary," dated August 2005, to the administrative jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Interior if: (1) the land is excess to military needs; and (2) all environmental remediation actions necessary to respond to environmental contamination have been completed. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to enter into an agreement with the Secretary of Defense to provide as much public access as possible to the Memorial without interfering with military needs. Makes such authority no longer applicable if the Memorial ceases to be an enclave within the Concord Naval Weapons Station. Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to enter into an agreement with the city of Concord, California, and the East Bay Regional Park District to establish and operate a facility for visitor orientation and parking, administrative offices, and curatorial storage for the Memorial. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary of Defense should remediate remaining environmental contamination related to the land. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretaries of Defense and the Interior should work together to develop a process by which future repairs and necessary modifications to the Memorial can be achieved in as timely and cost-effective a manner as possible.
Title
Port Chicago Naval Magazine National Memorial Enhancement Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] |
Rep. Ellen Tauscher [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. | |
2009-07-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 3 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR 7/14/2009 H8046-8047) | |
2009-07-15 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8115) | |
2009-07-14 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-07-14 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1044. | |
2009-07-14 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8046-8048) | |
2009-07-14 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to House Armed Services | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1469 (Related) 2009-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Accidents
California
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
California
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism