US HB1019 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires full military honors to be provided for the funerals of certain veterans. Specifically, a veteran shall receive full military honors if the veteran (1) is first interred or inurned in Arlington National Cemetery, (2) was awarded the medal of honor or the prisoner-of-war medal, and (3) is not entitled to full military honors because of such veteran's grade.
Title
Full Military Honors Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia
Cemeteries and funerals
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1019/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1019/BILLS-116hr1019ih.pdf |