US HB1003 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Commodity Exchange Act to revise the requirement that the Commodity Futures Trading Commission (CFTC), before promulgating a regulation or issuing an order, consider the costs and benefits of the action. Requires the CFTC, through the Office of the Chief Economist, to: (1) assess the costs and benefits, both qualitative and quantitative, of an intended regulation; and (2) propose or adopt a regulation only on a reasoned determination that the benefits justify the costs. Lists additional mandatory considerations for the CFTC to evaluate in making a reasoned determination of the costs and the benefits, including the impact on market liquidity in the futures and swaps markets, as well as alternatives to direct regulation.
Title
To improve consideration by the Commodity Futures Trading Commission of the costs and benefits of its regulations and orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2330 (Related) 2014-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2955-2957)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Finance and financial sector
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Commodities markets
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Finance and financial sector
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1003/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1003/BILLS-113hr1003ih.pdf |