US HB1002 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Act to authorize the debarment of certain registrants, and for other purposes.
Title
DEBAR Act of 2021 Debarment Enforcement of Bad Actor Registrants Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 411 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-36. |
2021-08-06 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-08-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5111) |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 5 (Roll no. 112). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1763) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1831-1832) |
2021-04-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1002. |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1763-1764) |
2021-04-14 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1285 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.