TX SJR33 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing school districts to create school security districts and impose ad valorem taxes for crime prevention measures; authorizing a tax.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing school districts to create school security districts and impose ad valorem taxes for crime prevention measures; authorizing a tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB509 (Enabled by) 2013-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Crime Prevention
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SJR33 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SJ00033I.htm |