TX SJR27 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain tax bills to be approved by two-thirds of all the members elected to each house of the legislature.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain tax bills to be approved by two-thirds of all the members elected to each house of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SJR27 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SJ00027I.htm |