TX SJR24 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment allowing the expenditure of motor vehicle fuel taxes and registration fees for passenger rail, transit, and freight rail.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment allowing the expenditure of motor vehicle fuel taxes and registration fees for passenger rail, transit, and freight rail.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-16 | Filed | |
2009-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR9 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HJR122 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
HJR122 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration