TX SJR2 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 60-13)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed for general elementary and secondary public school purposes on the residence homestead of a person who is elderly or disabled to reflect any statutory reduction from the preceding tax year in the maximum compressed rate of the maintenance and operations taxes imposed for those purposes on the homestead.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed for general elementary and secondary public school purposes on the residence homestead of a person who is elderly or disabled to reflect any statutory reduction from the preceding tax year in the maximum compressed rate of the maintenance and operations taxes imposed for those purposes on the homestead.

Sponsors

Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]
Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D]Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]
Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Angela Paxton [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Beverly Powell [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]
Sen. Drew Springer [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. John Whitmire [D]
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]
Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - House - Adopted RV#58 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - House - Postponed RV#9 (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-30 Filed with the Secretary of State
2021-08-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-08-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-08-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-08-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-08-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-26HouseRecord vote RV#58
2021-08-26HouseAdopted
2021-08-26HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-08-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-26HouseRecord vote RV#9
2021-08-26HousePostponed 8/26/21 3:00 PM
2021-08-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-26HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2021-08-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-08-10SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-10SenateRecord vote
2021-08-10SenatePassed as amended
2021-08-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-10SenateAmended
2021-08-10SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-08-10SenateVote reconsidered
2021-08-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenatePassed
2021-08-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-08-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-08-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-07SenateRecord vote
2021-08-07SenateRules suspended
2021-08-07SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-08-07SenateRead first time
2021-08-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-06SenateFiled
2021-08-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HJR2 (Same As) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB12 (Enabled by) 2021-09-17 - See remarks for effective date
HJR26 (Same As) 2021-08-27 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR2
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00002I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00002S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00002E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00002H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SJ00002F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SJ00002S3F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00002I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SJ00002I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SJ00002E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SJ00002H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SJ00002F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-07-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-09-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-10-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR2&RcdVtNo=9&Ch=H&Dt=08/26/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SJR2&RcdVtNo=58&Ch=H&Dt=08/26/2021

Bill Comments

feedback