TX SB12 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 78-12)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 78-12)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the residence homestead of an individual who is elderly or disabled to reflect any reduction from the preceding tax year in the district's maximum compressed rate and to the protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local revenue.
Title
Relating to the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the residence homestead of an individual who is elderly or disabled to reflect any reduction from the preceding tax year in the district's maximum compressed rate and to the protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2021-09-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-08-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-08-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-08-30 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Read |
2021-08-29 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-08-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-27 | House | Record vote RV#63 |
2021-08-27 | House | Passed |
2021-08-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-08-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-08-26 | House | Amended 1-Meyer |
2021-08-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-08-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-08-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-08-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-08-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-08-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-08-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-08-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-08-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-08-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-08-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Filed |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB11 (Same As) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Ways & Means
SJR2 (Enabling for) 2021-08-31 - Co-author authorized
SJR2 (Enabling for) 2021-08-31 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District