TX SJR18 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the making of a reverse mortgage loan for the purchase of homestead property and to amend certain requirements in connection with a reverse mortgage loan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the making of a reverse mortgage loan for the purchase of homestead property and to amend certain requirements in connection with a reverse mortgage loan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-16 - House - SJR 18Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-30 Filed with the Secretary of State
2013-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-21 Filed with the Secretary of State
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-17SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-17SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-16HouseRecord vote
2013-05-16HouseAdopted
2013-05-16HouseLaid out as postponed business
2013-05-16HousePostponed
2013-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-16HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2013-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-16HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2013-04-16HouseRead first time
2013-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-12SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-12SenateRecord vote
2013-03-12SenatePassed
2013-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-12SenateRecord vote
2013-03-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-03-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-02-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-02-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-02-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-02-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-02-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-01-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-01-29SenateRead first time
2013-01-15SenateFiled
2013-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback