TX SCR25 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing continued support for the construction of a monument on Capitol grounds recognizing Texans who served in the Vietnam War.
Title
Expressing continued support for the construction of a monument on Capitol grounds recognizing Texans who served in the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-17 | Adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to House Administration | |
2011-04-29 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Adopted | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Administration | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed | |
2011-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
VIETNAM WAR MONUMENT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
VIETNAM WAR MONUMENT