TX SCR12 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
Title
Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Adopted RV#1294 (Y: 85 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1294 |
2021-05-20 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR14 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
HCR52 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Postponed 4/21/22 10:00 AM
HCR52 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Postponed 4/21/22 10:00 AM