TX HCR52 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Postponed 4/21/22 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Postponed 4/21/22 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
Title
Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Postponed 4/21/22 10:00 AM |
2021-05-19 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-14 | House | Postponed 5/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR12 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
HCR14 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
HCR14 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee