TX SCR10 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the heroism and sacrifice of Refugio High School graduate and Congressional Medal of Honor recipient Lloyd Herbert "Pete" Hughes Jr.
Title
Honoring the heroism and sacrifice of Refugio High School graduate and Congressional Medal of Honor recipient Lloyd Herbert "Pete" Hughes Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-03 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |