TX SB987 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of dangerous wild animals.
Title
Relating to the regulation of dangerous wild animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |