TX SB985 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reports by the Public Utility Commission of Texas on the ability of electric generators to respond to abnormal weather conditions.
Title
Relating to reports by the Public Utility Commission of Texas on the ability of electric generators to respond to abnormal weather conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |