TX SB977 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition, use, rebate, and refund of certain taxes related to certain hotel business revenue.
Title
Relating to the imposition, use, rebate, and refund of certain taxes related to certain hotel business revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Passed | |
2011-05-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-07 | Record vote | |
2011-05-07 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-07 | Amended | |
2011-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-07 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-25 | Filed | |
2011-02-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
GULF OF MEXICO
HOTELS & MOTELS
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Taxation--Sales
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
GULF OF MEXICO
HOTELS & MOTELS
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
Taxation--Sales