TX SB969 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain correctional officers and jailers.
Title
Relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain correctional officers and jailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition