TX SB944 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression
Action: 2009-03-23 - Co-author authorized

Summary

Relating to a grant program to provide children at risk of hunger or obesity with increased access to nutritious foods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a grant program to provide children at risk of hunger or obesity with increased access to nutritious foods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-23 Co-author authorized
2009-03-09 Referred to Health & Human Services
2009-03-09 Read first time
2009-03-02 Co-author authorized
2009-02-18 Filed
2009-02-18 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1622 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback