TX SB93 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the suspension of a driver's license for failure to pay a surcharge.
Title
Relating to the suspension of a driver's license for failure to pay a surcharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Sen. Donald Huffines [R] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-23 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-22 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Education--Driver Education & Training
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road