TX SB904 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Cresson Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Hood County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Cresson Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Hood County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-04SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2017-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-28SenateRead first time
2017-02-15SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-02-15SenateFiled
2017-02-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback