TX SB903 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the integrity of elections in this state; imposing a civil penalty; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the integrity of elections in this state; imposing a civil penalty; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Elections
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenatePassed
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-11SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback