TX SB883 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to promotional items provided by manufacturers, wholesalers, and distributors of alcoholic beverages to retailers.
Title
Relating to promotional items provided by manufacturers, wholesalers, and distributors of alcoholic beverages to retailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |