TX SB868 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use, possession, delivery, or manufacture of testing equipment that identifies the presence of fentanyl, or any other adulterant.
Title
Relating to the use, possession, delivery, or manufacture of testing equipment that identifies the presence of fentanyl, or any other adulterant.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2042 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Public Health
HB2042 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Public Health
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB362 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB685 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB867 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Health
HB1018 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Public Health
HB1584 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB2042 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Public Health
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB362 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB685 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB867 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Health
HB1018 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Public Health
HB1584 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB868 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00868I.htm |