TX SB865 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a power outage alert system and a study on a statewide disaster alert system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a power outage alert system and a study on a statewide disaster alert system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB655 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback