TX SB826 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sequencing of required English language arts courses and mathematics courses in schools and conforming changes.
Title
Relating to the sequencing of required English language arts courses and mathematics courses in schools and conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1299 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed |
2017-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |