TX SB825 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of affordable housing in colonias, rural communities, and small municipalities.
Title
Relating to the provision of affordable housing in colonias, rural communities, and small municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2011-03-17 | Rereferred to committee | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-21 | Filed | |
2011-02-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Rural
RURAL
RURAL COMMUNITY & SMALL MUNICIPALITY HOUSING INITIATIVES, OFFICE OF
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Rural
RURAL
RURAL COMMUNITY & SMALL MUNICIPALITY HOUSING INITIATIVES, OFFICE OF