TX SB8 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health plan and health benefit plan coverage for elective abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health plan and health benefit plan coverage for elective abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-26SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-07-26SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed
2017-07-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-18SenateFiled
2017-07-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB8
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00008I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00008S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00008E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F1.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-26-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments

feedback