TX SB784 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rates established by municipalities for water and sewer services.
Title
Relating to rates established by municipalities for water and sewer services.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2224 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources