TX SB768 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2013-05-22 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |