TX SB764 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to accounting for costs incurred by this state as a result of the presence of persons who are not lawfully present in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to accounting for costs incurred by this state as a result of the presence of persons who are not lawfully present in the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-08SenateRecord vote
2017-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Finance
2017-02-22SenateRead first time
2017-02-07SenateFiled
2017-02-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback