TX SB749 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of a medication and the ordering and administration of an immunization or vaccination by a pharmacist.
Title
Relating to the administration of a medication and the ordering and administration of an immunization or vaccination by a pharmacist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1105 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
HB1105 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
HB1105 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Subjects
IMMUNIZATIONS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB749 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00749I.htm |