TX SB735 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to periodic rate adjustment by and to certain transactions involving electric utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to periodic rate adjustment by and to certain transactions involving electric utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1291 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective immediately
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-03HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateAmended
2017-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-03SenateFiled
2017-02-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback