TX SB73 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting and certification requirements by certain physicians regarding certain abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-25SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenatePassed
2017-07-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-25SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-24SenateAmended
2017-07-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-24SenateRecord vote
2017-07-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateRecord vote
2017-07-20SenateRules suspended
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order overruled
2017-07-20SenatePoint of order
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-18SenateFiled
2017-07-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback