TX SB727 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing certain inmates to apply for supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits to be provided at the time of discharge or release.
Title
Relating to allowing certain inmates to apply for supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits to be provided at the time of discharge or release.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1743 (Same As) 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
HB1743 (Same As) 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
HB1743 (Same As) 2023-06-12 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB727 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00727I.htm |