TX SB726 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the judicial access and improvement account to provide funding for basic civil legal services, indigent defense, and judicial technical support through certain county service fees and court costs imposed to fund the account.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the judicial access and improvement account to provide funding for basic civil legal services, indigent defense, and judicial technical support through certain county service fees and court costs imposed to fund the account.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Earl Wentworth [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-31 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-28 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-02 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-15 | Filed | |
2011-02-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Justice
Courts--Municipal
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
SUPREME COURT
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Justice
Courts--Municipal
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
SUPREME COURT