TX SB719 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to collect, study, and report certain data regarding workforce education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to collect, study, and report certain data regarding workforce education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1749 (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1698 (Y: 113 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-21SenateRead first time
2017-02-02SenateFiled
2017-02-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB719
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00719I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00719S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00719E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00719H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00719F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB719&RcdVtNo=1698&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB719&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB719&RcdVtNo=1749&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=52

Bill Comments

feedback