TX SB715 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-29 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-29 - Point of order sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal annexation.
Title
Relating to municipal annexation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2047 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2046 (Y: 91 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House grants request for conference committee RV#1931 (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1539 (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1499 (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1498 (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1497 (Y: 87 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2047 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2046 (Y: 91 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House grants request for conference committee RV#1931 (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1539 (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1499 (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1498 (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1497 (Y: 87 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Senate | Point of order sustained |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-28 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-28 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-28 | House | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees with instructions |
2017-05-26 | House | Motion prevails |
2017-05-26 | House | Motion to instruct conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |