TX SB705 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to long-term care consumer information and Medicaid waiver programs.
Title
Relating to long-term care consumer information and Medicaid waiver programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time | |
2009-02-06 | Filed | |
2009-02-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
LONG-TERM CARE
MEDICAID