TX SB70 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a single local use tax rate as an alternative to combined local use tax rates for computing the amount of local use taxes remote sellers are required to collect and to the allocation of tax revenue collected at that rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a single local use tax rate as an alternative to combined local use tax rates for computing the amount of local use taxes remote sellers are required to collect and to the allocation of tax revenue collected at that rate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2153 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . October 1, 2019

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback