TX SB696 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Summary
Relating to the use of certain state parking facilities, including the lease of the facilities, to other persons.
Title
Relating to the use of certain state parking facilities, including the lease of the facilities, to other persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-06 | Filed | |
2009-02-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1732 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
PARKING
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
PARKING
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions