TX SB687 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection and use of certain information relating to child abuse and neglect and the provision of prevention and early intervention services; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to the collection and use of certain information relating to child abuse and neglect and the provision of prevention and early intervention services; creating an offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-20 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1446 (Y: 52 N: 81 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2017-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | Failed to pass to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF