TX SB679 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers and health benefit plan issuers in relation to prescription drug coverage.
Title
Relating to the regulation of pharmacy benefit managers and health benefit plan issuers in relation to prescription drug coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1093 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Insurance
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB679 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00679I.htm |