TX SB675 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain advance directives and health care and treatment decisions.
Title
Relating to certain advance directives and health care and treatment decisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R] |
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADVANCE DIRECTIVES
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB675 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00675I.htm |