TX SB629 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability for interest if land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as agricultural or open-space land is sold or diverted to a different use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability for interest if land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as agricultural or open-space land is sold or diverted to a different use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenatePassed
2017-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-27SenateRecord vote
2017-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Finance
2017-02-13SenateRead first time
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-26SenateFiled
2017-01-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback