TX SB627 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to notice of a property owner's rights relating to the examination or survey of property by an entity with eminent domain authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notice of a property owner's rights relating to the examination or survey of property by an entity with eminent domain authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed
2017-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-11SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-13SenateRead first time
2017-01-26SenateFiled
2017-01-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback